Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Carozza
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee, the State Team, to identify and address the factors contributing to suicide deaths and facilitate system changes in the State to prevent suicide deaths; requiring the State Teams to meet quarterly and report annually to the Governor and General Assembly; providing for the sharing of information with and confidentiality of information obtained by the Committee; exempting Committee meetings from the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0048
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0168 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-1001 through 5-1009 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2022 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page