Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, except under specified circumstances, either the Maryland Transit Administration or an accredited representative to request that a fact finder be employed to resolve a labor dispute; repealing the requirement that the Administration submit a specified labor dispute to an arbitration board; requiring the Administration, under specified circumstances, to request the State Labor Relations Board to resolve a specified labor dispute in a specified manner; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
10/21/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 10/21/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page