Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual who is serving a term of confinement to petition a court to reduce the sentence under certain circumstances; limiting the number of petitions that an individual may file to two; and establishing procedures for a proceeding under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0724
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143024/1
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143024/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {163528/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-22)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {673029/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (22-21)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {143024/1 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {143024/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {143024/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Floor Amendment {163528/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-22) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Floor Amendment {673029/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted (22-21) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {483627/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 6:26 PM
Click to return on the top page