Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program - Funding for Underserved and Overburdened Communities
Sponsored by
Senators A. Washington, Augustine, Benson, Brooks, Hester, Jackson, Kagan, Lewis Young, McCray, Rosapepe, M. Washington, and Watson
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring at least 40% of funding provided under the comprehensive flood management grant program to be used for projects located in or directly benefiting underserved or overburdened communities and areas in which over 90% of households are at extreme risk of flooding in the next 30 years; and authorizing the Governor to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of up to $20,000,000 for the comprehensive flood management grant program in fiscal year 2026 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0449
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0813 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-20)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program - Funding for Underserved and Overburdened Communities
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803823/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program - Funding for Underserved and Overburdened Communities and Areas at Extreme Risk of Flooding
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303327/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (116-20) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program - Funding for Underserved and Overburdened Communities
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page