Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service and the Commissioned Corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for the purpose of granting a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans, and surviving spouses of eligible veterans.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1617
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0231 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {617175/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-10)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {617175/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (127-10) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Text - Chapter -
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page