Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program to authorize the use of noise abatement monitoring systems in Montgomery County and Prince George's County to enforce certain motor vehicle noise requirements; requiring a county that authorizes a program of noise abatement monitoring systems to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2025, on the effectiveness, performance, appropriate locations, costs and revenues, and citations issued in relation to the program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0212
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2023
Legislative Date
10/25/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2024
Legislative Date
1/15/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-35)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2023 10/25/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Senate 1/15/2024 1/15/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments {313520/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Noise Abatement Monitoring Systems - Pilot Program
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (99-35) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page