Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting, under certain circumstances, employers with respect to service advisors who primarily sell or service automobiles, farm equipment, trailers, or trucks from the requirement that certain employers pay overtime wages.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page