Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the penalties for intentionally causing physical injury to a bus operator, a train operator, a light rail operator, a paratransit operator, a station attendant, or any other individuals providing public transit services.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0091 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/18/2022 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page