Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2033, the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Commission.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2021
Legislative Date
9/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2021 9/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Senate 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page