Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Miller, and West
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain museums to claim title to certain property in the possession of the museum; requiring a museum, before taking title to certain property, to provide notice by certified mail; authorizing a museum, under certain circumstances, to provide notice by publication; requiring a lender to assert ownership of certain property within 60 days of a certain notice; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a museum to apply certain conservation measures to certain property; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1302
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938873/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593899/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {453626/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Washington and Lee)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {938873/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {593899/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Floor Amendment {453626/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hester, Washington and Lee) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-801, 16-802, 17-401 through 17-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page