Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Ferguson, King, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship; altering the employment requirements relating to a service obligation associated with a scholarship; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission's annual report to the General Assembly to include data on the number of scholarship recipients who received a baccalaureate degree from a 4-year institution in the State and the number of scholarships for which the service obligation was deferred, waived, or converted into a student loan; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274664/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {124131/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {274664/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions
(   18-3601, 18-3603, 18-3604, 18-3607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page