Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified members of the board of directors of the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; requiring one regular member of the board of directors of the Commission who is appointed by the Governor to be a resident of Montgomery County or Prince George's County; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0285
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Motion to Suspend Rule 46A (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {513320/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {143828/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {390817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Motion to Suspend Rule 46A (Senator Feldman) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Floor Amendment {513320/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Floor Amendment {143828/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {390817/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text - Chapter - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page