Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the determination of the jurisdictional law governing the meaning and effect of the terms of a trust under the Maryland Trust Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0491
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust Provisions
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page