Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified notices and statements relating to homeowner's insurance to be delivered by electronic means if the insurer complies with specified requirements; authorizing insurers to comply with specified renewal notice requirements relating to homeowner's insurance by sending a specified notice; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt by regulation a specified notice to be provided to insureds and policyholders at each renewal that contains specified information; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0291
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {367173/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Economic Matters 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text - Chapter - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
(   19-202, 19-205, 19-206, 19-206.1, 19-207, 19-209.1, 19-210, 19-214, 19-215, 19-216, 27-501, 27-601.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page