Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the State may withdraw from the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative by requiring the General Assembly to enact a law approving the withdrawal.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0230
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-45)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-45) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text - Chapter - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
(   2-1002 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page