Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Hershey, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Norman, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Benson, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland Energy Innovation Institute as part of the A. James Clark School of Engineering to collaborate with academic institutions on clean energy programs in the State and to attract private investment to clean energy innovation and commercialization in the State; establishing the Maryland Energy Innovation Fund to be used by the Institute and the Maryland Clean Energy Center; requiring the Center to develop a plan to become self-sustaining 5 years after the effective date of the Act; altering the purposes of the Center; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0410
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-18)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {667879/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Economic Matters Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (122-18) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
(   10-801, 10-806, 10-807, 10-808, 10-810, 10-823, 10-825, 10-828 through 10-839, 10-829 through 10-837 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page