Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties in Washington County for an employee of a license holder who violates the prohibition against selling or providing alcoholic beverages to an individual under the age of 21 years; and providing that an offender convicted of a third offense is subject to a term of imprisonment not exceeding 2 years and a $1,000 fine or both.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - Penalties
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   31-102, 31-2702, 6-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page