Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that annuity contracts purchased under the optional retirement program shall be issued to and become the property of participating employees of the program; clarifying that the rights of participating employees who purchase annuity contracts under the program are fully vested and not subject to forfeit; authorizing a participating employee in the optional retirement program to select specified annuity contracts for the transfer of existing balances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {489537/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164563/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {489537/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Appropriations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {164563/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee Rights
(   30-101, 30-206, 30-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page