Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drug Abuse Treatment Programs - Locations and Economic Impact Study
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the University of Baltimore jointly to identify the location of each drug abuse treatment program in the State and study and evaluate the economic impact of each program on surrounding businesses and residential neighborhoods; requiring the Department and the University jointly to report their findings under the Act to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; and terminating the Act after May 31, 2015.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0584
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page