Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified insured to obtain specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage, instead of specified uninsured motorist coverage, under a private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policy; requiring specified insurers to offer specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; providing for the characteristics of the enhanced underinsured motorist coverage; applying the Act to motor vehicle policies issued, sold, or delivered in the State on or after July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0005
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-34)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Supplemental Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {167472/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Economic Matters 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (106-34) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Text - Chapter - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
(   19-509, 19-509.1, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-511, 19-511.1, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page