Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county to establish a local youth violence review committee to prevent violence and homicides involving youth assailants and youth victims by promoting cooperation among certain agencies, providing youth services, determining the causes of youth violence, and recommending certain changes; specifying that certain officials may organize a local youth violence review committee; providing the committee with access to certain information; providing that certain records obtained by the committee are confidential; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0093
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
(   1-601 through 1-607 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:13 PM
Click to return on the top page