Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals
Sponsored by
Senators Gile, Ferguson, Augustine, Beidle, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, Kelly, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Zucker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing a certain civil penalty and administrative penalty for employers knowingly failing to properly classify individuals as employees; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to refer to the Comptroller and the U.S. Department of Labor certain complaints that allege a violation of certain tax laws under certain circumstances.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0465
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0838 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2024
Legislative Date
1/19/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2024 1/19/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {413727/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Economic Matters 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page