Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Sponsored by
Senators Cassilly, Jennings, and Gallion
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an individual serve beer, wine, and liquor under a Harford County stadium beer, wine, and liquor license only in plastic, Styrofoam, or paper containers and authorizing an individual to serve beer, wine, and liquor under the license by the drink and by the bottle, from one or more outlets, for on-premises consumption.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263326/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Economic Matters 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263326/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page