Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Klausmeier, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person, subject to certain limitations, to directly or indirectly advertise for or solicit business in the State for a diagnostic laboratory test or procedure ordered by a physician and performed by a medical laboratory that is certified under 42 U.S.C. § 263a; requiring a certain person to disclose that the test or procedure may or may not be covered by health insurance; authorizing the Secretary of Health to take legal action to restrict the marketing of the test or procedure under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626087/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {287677/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {626087/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text - Chapter - Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page