Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Young, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Salling, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the statute of limitations on civil actions arising out of an alleged incident or incidents of sexual abuse that occurred while the victim was a minor; establishing a statute of repose for specified civil actions relating to child sexual abuse; providing that, in a specified action filed more than a specified number of years after the victim reaches the age of majority, damages may be awarded against a person or governmental entity that is not an alleged perpetrator only under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {458675/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Judiciary 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Text - Chapter - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page