Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Veto overridden (32-15)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified institutions of higher education from using information about the criminal history of applicants on admissions applications; allowing an institution of higher education to use a third-party admissions application that contains questions about the criminal history of the applicant under specified conditions; prohibiting an institution of higher education from automatically or unreasonably restricting a student's admission based on that student's criminal history; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0694
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): December 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-44)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Overridden (32-15)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {494033/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {774863/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Overridden (32-15)
(   26-501 through 26-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page