Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to make available the investigational drug, biological product, or device to eligible patients; requiring a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to notify a specified patient and a specified health care provider of specified side effects or risks; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to develop an informed consent form that meets specified requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0584
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {673726/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {327272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {886082/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate McMillan) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Glenn) Adopted (97-40)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-50)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {957074/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {673726/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {327272/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {886082/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate McMillan) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Glenn) Adopted (97-40) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-50) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Refuses Recede 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   21-2B-01 through 21-2B-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page