Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Sunset
Sponsored by
Senators Corderman, Bailey, Benson, Elfreth, Jackson, Jennings, King, McCray, Salling, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain reporting requirement relating to an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain materials, parts, and equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or certain aircraft systems; and repealing the termination date of the exemption.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Sunset
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Favorable with Amendments {343221/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Sunset
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Ways and Means 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {743225/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Sunset
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page