Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the juvenile court to consider, when determining a term of probation for a juvenile, the purposes set forth in a specified provision of law; specifying that a term of probation may not exceed 1 year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0893
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Probation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Probation
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page