Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation, on submission of the budget bill to the General Assembly, to provide certain committees of the General Assembly a report on the estimated costs of certain projects; extending, from December 1 to December 20, the date by which the Spending Affordability Committee must submit a certain report; requiring the Spending Affordability Committee to include certain information in a certain report; requiring the Consolidated Transportation Program to include certain tables; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Appropriations 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Text - Chapter - Department of Transportation and Spending Affordability Committee - Reports
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:08 PM
Click to return on the top page