Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Kelley, Madaleno, Ramirez, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a residential boarding education program for students enrolled in grade 7 or higher; providing that specified students shall be eligible to participate in the program if the students are disadvantaged children, at-risk youth, and residents of the State and if an operator files a specified plan; requiring operators of the program to meet specified qualifications, adopt specified standards, conduct specified outreach programs, provide specified information, and encourage student participation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Ways and Means 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text - Chapter - Residential Boarding Education Programs for At-Risk Youth - Eligibility
(   8-701, 8-702, 8-703, 8-704, 8-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page