Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending, from October 1, 2024, to July 1, 2026, the date by which individuals must be licensed by the State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators before practicing as an assisted living manager in the State; altering the requirements for the manager training course that certain assisted living managers are required to complete; and altering the requirements for serving as an interim assisted living manager.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Board of Long-Term Care Administrators - Requirements for Assisted Living Managers
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/21/2024 9:56 AM
Click to return on the top page