Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Pinsky, Sydnor, Beidle, Jackson, McCray, Guzzone, Augustine, Elfreth, Smith, and West
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring regulations of a primary procurement unit to require the unit to make a good faith effort to solicit at least one bid from a certified minority business enterprise for a small procurement in Category II and Category III of the State Procurement Regulations; requiring a certain report to the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to state the total number and value of contracts entered into by the unit for which no minority business enterprise participation goals were established; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904139/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {206681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Simonaire and Lam)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Procurement – Department of General Services – MBE Program Compliance Officer
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {904139/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - MBE Program Compliance Review and Oversight
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {206681/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Washington, Simonaire and Lam) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page