Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Zucker, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider to disclose a medical record without specified authorization to a guardian ad litem appointed by a court to protect specified interests of a minor or a disabled or elderly individual who is a specified victim, for a specified purpose and for use in specified court proceedings; authorizing a specified guardian ad litem to redisclose a specified record under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text - Chapter - Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
(   4-302, 4-304, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page