Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Lee, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources, on a showing by an applicant for long-term Medicaid benefits that the applicant has been unable to obtain from a specified fiduciary institution financial records related to financial and real property assets necessary to establish the applicant's eligibility or ineligibility for public assistance, to request and obtain the records; requiring the Department to adopt regulations stating the requirements an applicant must satisfy for the Department to request financial records; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877379/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {877379/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text - Chapter - Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page