Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to vacate a certain probation before judgment or judgment of conviction under certain circumstances; establishing the requirements for a certain motion; requiring the State to notify a certain defendant of the filing of a certain motion in a certain manner; authorizing the defendant to file a response to a certain motion within 30 days after receipt of a certain notice; requiring that a certain victim or victim's representative be notified of a certain hearing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {758171/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {758171/1 Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page