Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Gile
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to establish a process for performing major highway capacity expansion project impact assessments; requiring the Department and a metropolitan planning organization to perform an impact assessment under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to use the impact assessment to determine whether a project meets certain requirements; requiring the Department and a metropolitan planning organization to develop a certain mitigation plan under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0836
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
(   2-103.1,   2-901 through 2-907 )
Last Updated: 4/5/2024 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page