Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freedom to Read Act
Sponsored by
Senators King, Beidle, Benson, Brooks, Elfreth, Feldman, Ferguson, Gile, Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, Kagan, Kelly, Kramer, Lewis Young, McCray, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a State policy that local school systems operate their school library media programs consistent with certain standards; requiring each local school system to develop a policy and procedures to review objections to materials in a school library media program; prohibiting a county board of education from dismissing, demoting, suspending, disciplining, reassigning, transferring, or otherwise retaliating against certain school library media program personnel for performing their job duties consistent with certain standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0785
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Freedom to Read Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173028/1
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {273022/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (12-33)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {863729/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Freedom to Read Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-38)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-11)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Freedom to Read Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Freedom to Read Act
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {173028/1 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Ready) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {173028/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Amendment {273022/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (12-33) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Amendment {863729/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (13-32) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Freedom to Read Act
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223027/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-38) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (31-11) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Freedom to Read Act
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:32 PM
Click to return on the top page