Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain hours of sale, certain square footage requirements, and a certain license fee for the holder of a public market license in the 46th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to waive certain distance restrictions for an application for the transfer of a license into a certain area; repealing a provision of law authorizing the Board to issue not more than two Class B licenses in a certain area in the 46th alcoholic beverages district; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1115
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {643327/1 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {473622/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Economic Matters 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments {463229/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Floor Amendment {643327/1 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 5:00 PM
Click to return on the top page