Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Conway, Guzzone, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Superintendent of Schools to convene a task force to consider the circumstances under which, and the schools or types of schools in which, restraint and seclusion shall be prohibited and to consider contraindications for restraint and seclusion and who may authorize restraint and seclusion; providing for the composition of the task force; requiring the task force to review existing regulations concerning seclusion and to make specified recommendations to the State Board and the General Assembly by October 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017, June 30, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654030/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Behavior Intervention Plans - Physical Restraint and Seclusion
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {654030/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Text - Chapter - Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and Reporting
(   7-1101 through 7-1104, 7-1102, 7-1102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page