Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that motor scooter sharing companies include on each motor scooter a tactile phone number through which an individual who is blind or visually impaired may contact the company; and requiring that motor scooter sharing companies provide individuals with disabilities certain nonvisual access to their websites and mobile applications that is consistent with certain federal standards.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {123325/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {397370/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Floor Amendment {123325/1 (Senator West) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-134.5, 18.7-101, 18.7-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page