Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain continuing education courses required by the State Real Estate Commission to include the principles of real estate brokerage relationships and disclosures; prohibiting licensees of the commission from disclosing confidential information obtained from a prospective client in anticipation of forming a brokerage relationship, unless the prospective client consents in writing to the disclosure; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {634734/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {634734/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Relationships, Continuing Education, and Disclosures
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
(   17-315, 17-528, 17-532, 17-534, 17-535 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page