Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring local correctional facilities to conduct an assessment of the mental health and substance use status of each inmate using evidence-based screening and assessments to determine whether opioid treatment or medication-assisted treatment for opioid addiction is appropriate; requiring each local correctional facility to make available at least one formulation of each FDA-approved full opioid agonist, partial opioid agonist, and long-acting opioid antagonist used for the treatment of opioid use disorders; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197176/1
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197176/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator King) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {197176/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
(   9-603, 9-603.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page