Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Board of License Commissioners and Board of Community College Trustees - Membership
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain numbers of members of the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County and the Board of Community College Trustees for Washington County shall belong to certain political parties based on the aggregate number of votes in the preceding election of the Board of County Commissioners.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0921
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Washington County - Board of License Commissioners and Board of Community College Trustees - Membership
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. (Finance)
Last Updated: 2/24/2024 10:48 AM
Click to return on the top page