Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Police Department - Consent Decree - Exceptions to State Law
Sponsored by
Senator McCray (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that if certain provisions or requirements of State law are determined by a certain court to be inconsistent with a certain consent decree between the United States of America, the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, and the Baltimore Police Department, those provisions or requirements of State law will have no force or effect under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore Police Department - Consent Decree - Exceptions to State Law
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore Police Department - Consent Decree - Exceptions to State Law
Last Updated: 3/2/2022 11:27 AM
Click to return on the top page