Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Social Workers - Sunset Extension, Notification of Complete Application, and Workgroup on Social Worker Examination Requirements for Licensure
Sponsored by
Senator M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Social Work Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Ace (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; establishing a certain workgroup to identify alternatives to examination requirements for a master social worker license, a certified social worker license, or a certified social worker-clinical license and develop recommendations for a certain assessment method to replace a certain examination requirement; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Social Workers - Licensure Examinations - Moratorium and Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913522/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Social Workers - Licensure Examinations - Moratorium and Workgroup
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {913522/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Social Workers - Sunset Extension, Notification of Complete Application, and Workgroup on Social Worker Examination Requirements for Licensure
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page