Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0871 - Social Workers - Sunset Extension, Notification of Complete Application, and Workgroup on Social Worker Requirements for Licensure

Finance 3/10/2023 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/30/2023 1:00:00 PM
As of: 6/14/2024 10:27:06 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Washington, M., Senator Washington, M. FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Bushrod, Dionne NASW Maryland FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Barber-Alexander, Brittany FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
McClellan, Daphne Board of Social Work Examiners, MD Dept. of Health UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Owens, Stacey UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Boston, Frank FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Collins-Green, Terri Maryland Office of Public Defender UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB871 Written testimony (1).pdf
FIN
Plaut, Ari Boston Plaut Attorneys at Law FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Reed, Bynia UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
Written Testimony for SB871.pdf
FIN
Basler, Robert FAV Arrow SB871 testimony.pdf FIN
Sung, Susanna UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
testimony.pdf
FIN
Doyle, William FWA Will Doyle-SB0871 _ SB0872 Testimony-3-9-23.pdf FIN
Harris, Tarahn Baltimore ABSW FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Kays, Lisa FAV Testimony from Lisa Kays on SB871 and SB872-2.pdf FIN
Poliakoff, Bracha FWA Testimony.pdf FIN
Mounty, Judith SWEAR FAV Mounty SWEAR Testimony--March 10, 2023.pdf FIN
Schagrin, Judith National Association of Social Workers - Maryland Chapter FWA NASW Maryland - 2023 SB 871 FWA - Social Worker Wo FIN
Burke, Christina FAV BurkeSWEARTestimony.pdf FIN
Benn, Stacey Morgan State University FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Bill Response - SB871.pdf
FIN
MDAD President, MDAD President FAV MDAD SB 871 - Social Workers - Licensure Examinati FIN
Leffler, Jacob FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Postmus, Judy University of Maryland School of Social Work INFO SB871 and SB872 SSW Bills SSW Postmus FIN-LOI 3-10 FIN
Acerno, Steven The Arc Northern Chesapeake Region FAV SBtestimony.pdf FIN
Hessler, Therese FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB871_MARFY_FAV.pdf
FIN
Klingenmaier, Lisa Catholic Charities of Baltimore FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0871_CC_Klingenmaier_FAV.pdf
FIN
Krone, Christine UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0871_UNF_MdCSWC_Social Workers - Lic. Exams - Mo
FIN
Bramble, Simone FAV Pressley Ridge _SB871_872_Written Testimony.pdf FIN
Davis, Lynda FWA SB871 and SB872.pdf FIN
Agalloco, Andrea FAV AAgalloco- Support SB0871 and SB0872.pdf FIN
Rodriguez, Victoria FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
VR Written Testimony SB0871 and SB0872.pdf
FIN
Berkley, Kyle FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
MGA March 9 2023.pdf
FIN
Pucci, Concetta FAV Pucci Testimony.pdf FIN
Perez, Chloe Hearts and Homes for Youth, Inc. FAV Senate Bill 0871 PDF.pdf FIN
Massey, Michael FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SupportSB0871-Massey.pdf
FIN
Ross, Philicia FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony.pdf
FIN
Stroud, Kimberly UNF Testimony (1).pdf FIN
Slicher, Mary C. Poject PLASE, Inc (People Lacking Ample Shelter & Employment) FAV Testimony March 10, 23 for SB 871 & 872.pdf FIN
Schaefer-Salins, Ellen Salisbury University FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Stewart, Vicky Health Care for the Homeless FAV Health Care for the Homeless - 2023 FAV SB 871 - S FIN
Wilkerson, Emanuel FWA Untitled document.pdf FIN
Smith, Nicole FAV SB 871and 872-Written Testimony.pdf FIN
Shaia, Wendy The Center for Restorative Change FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Abney, Karla Greater Washington Society of Clinical Social Work FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Gallant, Judith MD Clinical Social Work Coalition/Greater Washington Society for Clinical Social Work UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0871 - oral testimony, 3:10:2023.pdf
FIN
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony FIN
(MD), State of Maryland UNF 3 - SB 871 - FIN - B&C - Oppose.docx.pdf FIN
Bridges, Jordan FWA Jordan Bridges Written Testimony.pdf FIN
Panepinto, Lynn FAV testimony.pdf FIN
Davis, A. Imani FAV Testimony in Support of SB871_I. Davis .pdf FIN
Doyle, Rachel FWA R Doyle SB871.872 written testimony.pdf FIN
Vakalahi, Halaevalu Council on Social Work Education FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Sanner, *Cara Association of Social Work Boards UNF ASWB - Oppose SB 871.pdf FIN
Line, Ellen ROAR Wellness Co. FWA SB0871 0872 Testimony.pdf FIN
Respress, Christy Pathways to Housing DC FWA Pathways to Housing-SB0871-SB0872-Favorable-3-9-23 FIN
Schneider, Adam FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB871 - FIN - FAV - ASchneider.pdf
FIN
Smith, Maria Inclusive Therapy FWA Written Testimony 3.9.23.pdf FIN
Thomas, Eleshia SWEAR Team FAV Written Testimony for MGA.pdf FIN
Washington, Senator Mary FAV SB871_SponsorAmendment FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-10-2023 at 1250 PM FIN
Senator Washington, M., Senator Washington, M. FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Bushrod, Dionne NASW Maryland FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Barber-Alexander, Brittany FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
McClellan, Daphne Board of Social Work Examiners, MD Dept. of Health FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Doyle, William FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Will Doyle-SB0871_SB0145 Testimony-3-28-23.pdf
HGO
Ross, Philicia FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony March 28th 2023 (3).pdf
HGO
O. Breen, Kate Office of the Deaf & Hard of Hearing INFO GODHHSocialWork2.pdf HGO
Postmus, Judy University of Maryland School of Social Work FAV SB871 Social Workers - Sunset Extension, Notificat HGO
Kays, Lisa FAV Testimony from Lisa Kays on SB871 and SB145.pdf HGO
Hessler, Therese FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB871_Crossover_MARFY_FAV.pdf
HGO
Diamond, Joanna Health Care for the Homeless FAV Health Care for the Homeless - 2023 FAV SB 871 - S HGO
Schneider, Adam FWA SB871 - HGO - FAVwAm - ASchneider.pdf HGO
MDAD President, MDAD President FAV MDAD SB 871 - Social Workers - Licensure Examinati HGO
Schagrin, Judith National Association of Social Workers - Maryland Chapter FWA NASW Maryland - 2023 SB 871 FWA - Social Worker Wo HGO
Davis, Rebecca FAV SB0871 and SB0145 Davis and Stafford.pdf HGO
Shafer, Dawn FAV Shafer, Celestine-Donnor, Lehning Written testimon HGO
Bailey, Temeka Morgan State University FAV T.Bailey HGO Testimony 3.28.23.pdf HGO
Poliakoff, Bracha FWA Testimony.pdf HGO
Fuld, Samantha N/A FAV SB0871 and SB0145 Fuld.pdf HGO
Shdaimah, Corey FAV SW Professors Testimony.pdf HGO
Doyle, Rachel FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
871.145 written testimony.pdf
Long-Form Informational Sheet SB871.SB145.pdf
SWEAR Policy Brief for SB871 and SB145.pdf
HGO
Sanner, *Cara Association of Social Work Boards FAV ASWB - Support SB 871 amended FINAL.pdf HGO
Krone, Christine FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0871 - House_FWA_GWSCSW_Social Workers - Lic. Ex
HGO
Tome, Gretchen FAV Testimony SB871 SB145.pdf HGO
(MD), State of Maryland INFO 15b - SB 871 - HGO - MDH- LOI.docx.pdf HGO
Ross, Philicia Social Workers for Equity and Anti-Racism (SWEAR) FAV SWEAR HGO Testimony-SB0871-SB0145.pdf HGO
State of, Maryland FWA 15a - SB 871 - HGO - Social Work Bd - SWA.docx.pdf HGO
Smith, Maria Inclusive Therapy FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Maria's Written Testimony 3.28.23.pdf
HGO
Joyner, Tina MDAD FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Respress, Christy Pathways to Housing DC FAV Pathways HGO Testimony-SB0871-SB0145.pdf HGO
Massey, Michael FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Meyer, Megan FWA Favorable Support SB145 and SB 871 (002).pdf HGO
Rodriguez, Victoria FAV Written Testimony SB871 and SB145 For 3.30.23 -.pd HGO
Doyle, Rachel SWEAR FAV Follow-Up on SB871 + SB145 for HGO.pdf HGO
Click to return on the top page