Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno (By Request - Tax Credit Evaluation Committee) and Senators Kasemeyer, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "qualified position" and "State priority funding area" for purposes of the job creation tax credit program; requiring the Department of Commerce to certify the amount of the tax credit for which a qualified business entity is eligible; altering the calculation of the credits earned under the program; prohibiting the Department from certifying tax credits in a taxable year in excess of $4,000,000; applying the Act to job creation tax credits certified after December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1052
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {839930/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {839930/1 Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
(   6-301, 6-303, 6-304, 6-305, 6-307, 6-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page