Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Internship and Residency Training Requirements - Waiver for Former Service Members Injured in Combat
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain health occupations boards to waive certain internship or residency training requirements for licensure, certification, or registration for a former service member who is disabled as a result of combat deployment and who has successfully completed certain education requirements and passed a certain examination; altering certain provisions of law to include certain former service members with respect to whom certain health occupations boards are required to develop certain procedures; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Occupations - Internship and Residency Training Requirements - Waiver for Former Service Members Injured in Combat
Senate 3/09/2021 3/10/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-701, 1-702.1, 1-704, 1-705 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page