Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Terrorism Task Force
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Domestic Terrorism Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and develop a plan to establish a statewide network to communicate threats of domestic terrorism to the public and among State and federal governmental entities; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Domestic Terrorism Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Domestic Terrorism Task Force
Senate 3/09/2021 3/10/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:30 PM
Click to return on the top page